Simplify by using suitable rearrangement: (a) 4 x 927 x 25 (b) 250 x 60 x 50 x 8 About the author Arya

Answer: a) 9270 b) 6000000 Step-by-step explanation: a) 927 x 25 x 4 = 9270 b) 250 x 8 x 60 x 50 = 6000000 Reply

Answer

a 927*(25*4)

927*100

92,700.

b (60*8)(50*250)

480*12,500

6,000,000

Answer:a) 9270 b) 6000000

Step-by-step explanation:a) 927 x 25 x 4 = 9270

b) 250 x 8 x 60 x 50 = 6000000