find the product of the following by suitable rearrangement question 4×694×125×2 About the author Cora

Answer:125×8×25×40=1000×1000=1000000

b) 285×5×60=285×60×5=17100×5=85500

Answer:4×694×125×2=694,000

This is the answer ok