# 13 Math Tricks to Help You Solve Problems Without a Calculator

Learning maths is not everyone’s favorite subject but it can be fun if you take the time to explore different ways of visualizing math concepts and discover some easy maths tricks for kids!

Make maths a part of your daily lifestyle and practice these simple tricks for kids to sharpen your basic math skills.

Maths tricks for kids are fun and engaging, and a wonderful way to spark your child’s interest in math. There are so many math tricks that you can use to improve your child’s math skills. Math tricks come in many forms like mind games, riddles, calculator tricks, mental math tricks, and speed calculations tricks.

They have also been proven to be highly efficient, reliable, and quicker when it comes to solving math problems. They are also more interesting than traditional methods of solving math. Maths tricks will definitely fill your kids with amazement and it is a handy tool to have up your sleeve.

Here are 13 easy maths tricks for kids to boost calculation skills:

## 1. Multiplying Numbers Close to 10

If you want to find the product two numbers that are near 10, subtract one from the other and then multiply the result by 10. For example, if you have to multiply 63 by 89, subtract one from each number i.e. 63-1=62 and 89-1=88 so 62*10=620 and 88*10=880 which gives you the correct answer as 6200! This is an easy maths trick for kids because no time is wasted in finding out the actual number.

## 2. Multiplying Single Digit Numbers by 11

This is a simple but useful trick to multiply any single digit number by 11. For example, if you have to find the product of 23 and 46, subtract 3 from each one i.e. 23-3=20 and 46-3=43 so 20*11 = 220 and 43*11= 473 which gives you the total 620! Make it a habit to use this technique because it works with all single digit numbers including 0! This math trick for kids helps students save time while multiplying two single digit numbers without much effort or confusion.

## 3. Multiplying Two Double Digits Numbers Ending in 5/10/15/20

The basic trick to multiply two double-digit numbers ending in 5, 10, 15 or 20 is to add the digits together and then add them again. For example, if you have to find out how much 97 x 68 =, i.e. 9+7=16 so 1+6=7 and 6*8=48 which gives you a total of 54!

## 4. Multiplying Double Digits Numbers That End with Zeros

This maths trick for kids works well while multiplying any 2-digit number by 11! The calculations are simple but might take a while to master it completely. Here’s what you do: First get rid of all zeros from both numbers and get the product of their remaining digits! In case you have to multiply 13 x 16, i.e. 13 is the first number and 16 is the second one, get rid of all zeros from both numbers i.e. 1*3=3 and 3*6=18 so the final product is 36!

## 5. Multiplying Numbers with Large Digits

This is a great maths trick for kids that helps in finding out the total when the digits in both the numbers are large in size! For example, consider a case where you want to find out what will be 14 x 27! The total will be too big if normal long division is used with such large numbers so there’s another way around it. First divide both numbers by 10 so 14/10=1 and 27/10=2 so 1*3=3 and 2*7=14 which gives us the correct answer as 42!

## 6. Dividing Large Numbers by 100 & 1000

When you divide any large number with a factor of 100 or 1000, the calculations are often time consuming but it doesn’t have to be that way if you use this maths trick for kids. First divide both numbers by 10 i.e. 14/10=1 and 27/10=2 so 1*3+(-2)=1-2=-1 . The same rule applies even while dividing a large number with a factor of 1000 i.e. 1337/1000=13-37=-24 . This rule works with all other numbers as well!

## 7. Addition Tips for 2 Digit Numbers

This is an easy trick for adding two single digit numbers you’ll find useful when working with large sums of addition problems. For example, if you have to add 27+38, i.e. the first number is 27 so 2+7=9 and the second number is 38 so 3+8=11, then 9+1=10 which gives you 100 in your final answer! This maths trick for kids will help students save time while doing addition math quickly.

## 8. Finding 10 or 100 More or Less Than a Number

Find out how much ten more than a certain number will be by using this simple maths trick for kids. Just double the number and then add one to it i.e. if you have to find out how much 14 more than a certain number is, just double 7 which will give you the correct answer as 14*2=28! The same rule applies when finding 100 less or more than another number i.e. 77-100= -23 . This maths trick also works with big numbers of any kind!

## 9. Multiplying Big Numbers by 10

This math trick helps you multiply any large number by 10 in just 2 steps! For example, if you have to multiply 234 by 10, first separate half of 234 which will be 122 then place a zero at the of 122 so 502! Now you have the product which is 502! This maths trick comes in really handy when multiplying any number by 10.

## 10. Multiplying Numbers With 0 at the End

Finding out the total where both numbers end with zeros can be tough but not if you use this maths trick for kids correctly! For example, if you want to find out how much 95 x 97 is, i.e. 95 is the first number and 97 is the second one, then simply place two zeros after it so 9500 . Now divide both numbers by 100 so 9+5=14 and 9+7=16 , 14*7 = 98 so your final answer is 9848! This maths trick works great with other numbers too like 45 x 97 where the final answer is simply 4405 which you can easily find out if you use this trick correctly!

## 11. Addition Tips for 3 Digit Numbers with Large Digits

This maths trick for kids will help students save time while working on addition problems involving any number of digits but with large numbers. Here’s how to do it: First add the units of all the three numbers together i.e. 7+7+1=15 then, place one zero at the end of your answer so that only two digits are left in it e.g., 150 . Next, multiply what you already have by 10 and make sure not to shift any decimal point i.e., 15*10=1500 . Now find out how much is left out in your numbers i.e., 1+5=6 , so the final answer will be 15006!

## 12. Adding 3 Digit Numbers with Large Digits!

A simple trick for adding any number of digits but with large digits in them is to add up all the units together and then place a zero at the end of it so only two digits are left in it e.g, 077 . Next, find out what’s inside each digit by multiplying 100 for each unit then finally add up all your products to get your final answer that will be 7700 ! This maths trick for kids works great when adding numbers that have 4 or more digits!

## 13. Multiplying Big Numbers by 11!

Multiplying any number with 2 digits is never tough if you use this simple trick for kids correctly. For example, if you want to find out how much 89 x 11 is then multiply 10+9 i.e., 19 . To get the final answer just place one zero at the end of your answer so that only two digits are left in it e.g, 1900 . Now place a decimal point after your last digit i.e., 899 , which makes your final answer 189000 ! This math trick will help students save time while doing multiplication problems involving large numbers!

Maths tricks, when learned at an early age works like magic and helps students excel at academics as well as advanced courses opening up an array of opportunities for the future.