Multiply the following
Like this
a) 9975×305
9975× (300+5
9975×300+9975×5
992500+49875
=30,42,3

Question

Multiply the following
Like this
a) 9975×305
9975× (300+5
9975×300+9975×5
992500+49875
=30,42,375

b) 10572×3005
c) 93527×5008

Plz help For B and C part
answer for class 5​

in progress 0
Eloise 3 months 2021-07-19T21:02:54+00:00 2 Answers 0 views 0

Answers ( )

    0
    2021-07-19T21:03:56+00:00

    Answer:

    b) 31768860

    c) 468383216

    Step-by-step explanation:

    Hope it helps you!!!

    plz mark as brainliest......

    0
    2021-07-19T21:04:02+00:00

    Answer:

    I don’t know that question answer

Leave an answer

Browse

9:3-3+1x3-4:2 = ? ( )